Accounts and annual returns BEDONWELL JUNIOR SCHOOL PFA

Charity number: 1140261
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 November 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 24 November 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 March 2021 274 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required