NORTH WEST DURHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion and practice of the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrine of the Methodist Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

44 Trustee(s)
359 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Durham
Governance
- 07 February 2011: Previously excepted registration
- NWD CIRCUIT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
44 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Stuart Earl | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Temple | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Lees | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jennifer Gill | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melvin Elliott | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Ridley | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Metcalfe | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clive Gray | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Slatcher | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
John David Arbon | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Carroll | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
WENDY KATHRYN HARRISON | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY CARR | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
LYNN CHRISTINE WHITEHEAD | Trustee | 20 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Elizabeth Rutherford | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Thynne | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MEG GILKS | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HALL | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HOWE | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HUME | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL PINE | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
SONIA FILMER | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DIANE LESLEY TUTE | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
BERYL SPEARS | Trustee | 16 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL GRAHAM | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET BECK | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MAY MURPHY | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER REILLY | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANET ARBON | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JILL HURST | Trustee | 20 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev TERENCE HURST | Trustee | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANET QUINLAN | Trustee | 15 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Edward Spears | Trustee | 01 January 1961 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE JOBBURNS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR MCADOO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL KNOWLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OWEN LEIGHTON TEMPLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANGELA HIRD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA ELISABETH WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EILEEN ELAINE CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.02k | £185.38k | £196.13k | £186.59k | £187.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £282.60k | £233.44k | £217.04k | £219.01k | £318.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TYNE AVENUE
CONSETT
COUNTY DURHAM
DH8 6ER
- Phone:
- 01207593666
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window