Financial history CROWTHORNE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1140491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £178.49k £175.48k £147.66k £134.18k £154.63k
Total expenditure £131.53k £601.30k £229.96k £155.68k £143.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A