Trustees CROWTHORNE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1140491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Trevor John Allwright Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Sarah Ruth Webb Trustee 28 March 2023
None on record
Justine WELLS Trustee 07 April 2022
THE ARK PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
Matthew Patterson Trustee 07 April 2022
None on record
Emma Frost Trustee 07 April 2022
None on record
Rev Kevin David Mills Trustee 01 November 2020
None on record
Elaine Margaret Hood Trustee 13 March 2017
None on record
IAN JOHN BURROW Trustee
None on record
PHILIP DAMIAN HOOD Trustee
CROWTHORNE COMMUNITY MINIBUS
Received: On time