HAPPY SOUL FESTIVAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Happy Soul Festival promotes good health and wellbeing by raising awareness of mental health issues within Black and Minority Ethnic (BME) communities by using film, music and performance at an annual festival.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 March 2011: Standard registration
- 04 January 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HAPPY SOUL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.54k | £178.54k | £50.39k | £20.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.13k | £172.80k | £29.75k | £19.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 06 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 11 February 2015 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
11 February 2015 | 11 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 29 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 29 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH BY RAISING AWARENESS OF MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES WITHIN BME COMMUNITIES BY USING FILM, MUSIC AND PERFORANCE AT AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window