Trustees LIMES AVENUE BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1140574

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John George Dargie | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clive Burgess | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Wright | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thurairatnam Beril Ajithiran | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Charlton | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Simpson | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Woodward | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Charlton | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leroy Wint | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR KEITH SULLIVAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.