TRANSITION TOWN CLITHEROE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Transition Town Clitheroe aims to provide support, practical assistance and advice to individuals and local groups who are working to create greater local resilience in the face of the twin global challenges of peak oil and climate change. This support includes education (films/workshops/talks/books/DVDs/trips/courses) and practical projects eg tree planting, food growing, renewable energy).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 18 March 2011: Standard registration
- 24 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 08 April 2019 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 17 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DATED 15/01/2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN CLITHEROE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS OF THE RIBBLE VALLEY (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT'). A TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY WHATEVER CHARITABLE MEANS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; B TO PROMOTE POSITIVE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES OF WHATEVER TYPE SO AS TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window