B C MEHTA (FABLE & MANE) TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Advance the education of children living in India, Uganda and developing countries through the provision of facilities for education.The relief of sickness and poverty of people living in India, Uganda and developing countries through the provision of facilities, support services and equipment and by such other means as the trustees may determine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 26 July 2011: Standard registration
- B C MEHTA TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Akash Dilesh Mehta | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
KRISHNA MURTHY PANTHULA | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.13k | £3.01k | £1.19k | £7.64k | £367.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.88k | £9.45k | £83.31k | £88.77k | £279.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/07/2011 as amended on 05 Mar 2021 as amended on 27 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
1) To advance the education of children living throughout the world through the provision of facilities for education. 2) The relief of sickness and poverty for people living throughout the world through the provision of facilities, support services and equipment and by such other means as trustees may determine. 3) The relief of animal suffering throughout the world through the provision of facilities, support services and equipment and by such other means as the trustees may determine. 4) Such charitable purposes for the public benefit as are exclusively charitable according to the laws of England and Wales and as the trustees may from time to time determine.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BC MEHTA (FABLE AND MANE)TRUST LTD
AMERTRANS PARK
BUSHEY MILL LANE
WATFORD
UK
WD24 7JG
- Phone:
- 01923208116
- Email:
- info@bcmehtatrust.com
- Website:
-
bcmehtatrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window