LIGHT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Muslim Faith Schools (with a leadership specialism). Non-Faith Schools (with a leadership specialism). Development programmes to engage children, young people and communities to promote social action in the UK and beyond. Advocacy and campaign for education across the developing world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 February 2011: Standard registration
- TAUHEEDUL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- TAUHEEDUL GROUP (Previous name)
- TAUHEEDUL ISLAM FAITH EDUCATION AND COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAMRUDDIN KOTHIA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
FARUK DASU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHMED HANIF SUFI | Trustee |
|
||||||
FAZLURRAHMAN HASSAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
ISMAIL ADAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR MOHMMED ISAP | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.48k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 MAR 2025
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A. PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE FORMATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF ORGANISATIONS COMMITTED TO EDUCATION, COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING, RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP; AND B. PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE FORMATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF ORGANISATIONS COMMITTED TO COMMUNITY BENEFIT NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Light Trust
Shadsworth Road
Blackburn
BB1 2HT
- Phone:
- 03303139800
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window