LOZELLS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY SEEKS TO PROVIDE A SERVICE TO THE MULTI RACIAL COMMUNITY IN INNER CITY BIRMINGHAM WORKING IN CO-OPERATION WITH LOCAL CHURCHES, IT CURRENTLY WORKS IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE FEAST
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 06 April 2011: Standard registration
- 22 September 2011: Funds received from 1110934 LOZELLS PROJECT
- LOZELLS BOOKSHOP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DR ROBERT STEPHEN | Chair | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.52k | £1.16k | £936 | £717 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.41k | £23.93k | £23.53k | £40.10k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 292 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 292 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 658 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 658 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LOZELLS BIRMINGHAM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFD SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
288 HAMSTEAD ROAD
HANDSWORTH
BIRMINGHAM
B20 2RB
- Phone:
- 01215543407
- Email:
- rector@handsworthstmary.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window