Trustees GLASBURY ARTS LTD
Charity Number: 1140462

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Bugler | Trustee | 30 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenette Arnold | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Schofield | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clarissa Price | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Anne Parker-Smith | Trustee | 08 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Hughes | Trustee | 02 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARTHUR FITZGERALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALYSON LOUISE HEARN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.