THE ANIMAL PROTECTION AND WOODLAND ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees aim to purchase a woodland to turn into a nature reserve. As a new charity, they are researching fundraising strategies and potential woodlands to purchase.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
Governance
- 03 May 2011: Standard registration
- THE ANIMAL PROTECTION ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MISS CARRIE HOLLIMAN BA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Anthony Ellis BA | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Fancy | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £2.77k | £8.00k | £1.75k | £4.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.47k | £3.04k | £4.81k | £1.37k | £4.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 12 December 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 11 December 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 23 December 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/04/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION,PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 HARDING ROAD
BEXLEYHEATH
DA7 4PS
- Phone:
- 02083037011
- Email:
- CARRIEHOLLIMAN@YAHOO.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window