GREY COURT EDUCATION FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was established to advance the education and welfare of the pupils of Grey Court School and young people within the wider community by assisting in the provision of educational and recreational facilities and experiences to augment and complement such facilities financed by the local education authority or the Department for Education (DfE).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 April 2011: Standard registration
- 15 April 2018: Funds received from 1142822 GREY COURT SCHOOL FARM
- GCEF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Ridgers | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andree Michelle Frieze | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Shore | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Emma Thomas | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Rhodes | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.62k | £76.10k | £314.14k | £369.47k | £92.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.70k | £5.69k | £96.17k | £299.07k | £21.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/01/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF GREY COURT SCHOOL (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE SCHOOL") BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY OR THE DEPARTMENT FOR EDUCATION (DFE). IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE TRUSTEES MAY UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES, WHICH PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SCHOOL AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION, WELFARE AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ham street
ham
TW10 7HN
- Phone:
- 02089481173
- Email:
- office@greycourt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window