CALDMORE VILLAGE FESTIVAL LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Throughout the year the volunteers engage the community in a variety of community based projects e.g the Community house which when completed will be a base for community held events, the community garden which is open for all to use and develop. This culminates into a 3 day festival involving local music across all ages, genre and ethnicities, a variety of sporting events etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £47,300 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Walsall
Governance
- 29 September 2011: Standard registration
- CALDMORE VILLAGE FESTIVAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Arif | Chair | 20 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Farhana Fatehmamode | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ursula Walker | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Brookes | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|||||
David John Lawrence | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Jane Kells | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Martin Stone | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED FAHIM | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.36k | £108.43k | £144.60k | £175.11k | £206.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.62k | £89.05k | £118.16k | £180.33k | £167.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £700 | N/A | £32.26k | £47.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN CALDMORE IN THE BOROUGH OF WALSALL AND SURROUNDING AREAS INCLUDING BY: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH; THE PROMOTION OF ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; THE PROMOTION OF AMATEUR SPORTS BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE."
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caldmore Community House
12 Carless Street
WALSALL
WS1 3RH
- Phone:
- 07871813252
- Email:
- caldmoregarden@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window