THE IRONMONGERS' TRUST COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ironmongers' Trust Company is the Trustee of seven charities administered by the Ironmongers' Company.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD HUGH HUNTING CBE | Chair | 01 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||
John Anthony Biles TD | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Matthew Shaw Wylie Tilbury | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
David John Liming | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Mark Samuel Wilton Lee | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Julian Verden | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Thomas Randall Boddy | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew George Wauchope | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Ald Sir Peter Kenneth Estlin KStJ | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Kate Juliette Hughes | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
David John Worlidge | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD CHARLES ROE TWALLIN | Trustee | 07 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD JULIAN PATTESON-KNIGHT | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Mr H J Charnaud | Trustee | 03 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE OBJECTS. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE:- THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE OR SCIENCE BY SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Ironmongers Co
Ironmongers Hall
Shaftesbury Place
Barbican
LONDON
EC2Y 8AA
- Phone:
- 02077762311
- Email:
- helen@ironmongers.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window