THE BELACQUA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Belacqua Charitable Trust was established to provide grants to organisations concerned with the welfare of children, humanitarian concerns, the arts and the environment. We are interested in supporting applications from individuals or smaller organisations that are concerned with at least one of these. Applications by email only.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- Burma
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- India
- Nepal
- Romania
- United States
Governance
- 12 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Catherine Pullman | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES LOUIS OUTRAM PULLMAN | Trustee | 11 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ELIZABETH SUSAN PULLMAN | Trustee | 11 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS JOSEPH OUTRAM PULLMAN | Trustee | 11 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.43k | £128.26k | £28.24k | £0 | £41.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.20k | £34.37k | £70.54k | £42.79k | £76.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2022 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2022 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05/02/2009
Charitable objects
SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 GRESHAM ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH9 1QR
- Phone:
- 07932629422
- Email:
- belacquatrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window