FRIENDS OF RICHMOND PARK SHEFFIELD.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides facilities for a craft group, occasional meetings and support for a local disabled group's annual sports day within Sheffield's Richmond Park
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 04 May 2011: Standard registration
- FORP (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF RICHMOND PARK (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donna Pyne | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Day | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
IRENE DAY | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | 30/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.73k | £2.59k | £464 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.80k | £437 | £16.30k | £1.45k | £1.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £400 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 27 May 2025 | 331 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/01/2011 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2011 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: TO PROMOTE THE OPEN SPACE IN SHEFFIELD KNOWN AS RICHMOND PARK FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION, PLAY AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL INHABITANTS OF RICHMOND AND DISTRICTS (INTAKE, HOLLYBANK, NORMANTON SPRINGS, STRADBROKE, WOODHOUSE AND WOODTHORPE) WITHOUT DISTINCTION AND TO WORK WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS TO MANAGE, MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE PARK FOR SAID PURPOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Richmond Place
SHEFFIELD
S13 8LP
- Phone:
- 0114 2647398
- Email:
- forpsheffield@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window