Financial history NEXUS COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1141212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.89k £7.28k £5.22k £39.77k £62.39k
Total expenditure £37.59k £2.53k £6.20k £14.16k £69.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A