CENTRE FOR LEGAL AID ASSISTANCE AND SETTLEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WORK FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP,TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS,GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND OR AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- India
- Pakistan
Governance
- 11 April 2011: Standard registration
- 19 May 2011: Funds received from 1125027 CENTRE FOR LEGAL AID ASSISTANCE AND SETTLEMENT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nasir Saeed | Chair | 12 April 2011 |
|
|||||
Edgar Money | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PARVEEN Massey | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|||||
Rev Alwin Samuel | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.43k | £157.79k | £110.77k | £129.87k | £88.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.43k | £126.70k | £115.85k | £109.16k | £105.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.06k | £11.15k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 01/05/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/01/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYS OBJECTS(OBJECTS)ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP,TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS,GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND,INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT PARTICULARLY AMONGST PEOPLE WHO ARE BEING PERSECUTED AS A RESULT OF THEIR RELIGIOUS BELIEFS IN SUCH PARTS OF PAKISTAN OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
N Saeed
PO Box 81
Southall
UB2 5YQ
- Phone:
- 02081506763
- Email:
- info@claas.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window