WALTON STREET ANGELS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing patrols, consisting of a minimum of 3 volunteers, on the streets of Walton-on-Thames on Friday nights, between the hours of 10 p.m. and 3 a.m. The purpose of these patrols is to take care of anybody finding themselves vulnerable, most commonly from the effects of drinking too much alcohol and to engage with the public to enable them to feel safer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 February 2011: Standard registration
- 22 January 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.55k | £4.06k | £2.38k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.01k | £2.07k | £1.42k | £1.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 28 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 11 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 14 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 17 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM 25 JAN 2011
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELLBEING OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF ELMBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING AREAS, BY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE AND THE FORMATION OF STREET ANGELS PROGRAMME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY OF THE BOROUGH OF ELMBRIDGE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION OF THE MEMBERS OF SUCH COMMUNITY. B) TO SUPPORT, CARE AND TREAT PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE HOMELESS AND SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY, OLD AGE, ALCOHOLISM, DRUG ADDICTION, OFFENDING BEHAVIOUR, OR ANY OTHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY, AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window