BANHAM FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to UK registered charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Banham | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Keightley | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosanna Elizabeth Banham | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Francis Banham | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Banham | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Mary-Ann Herbert | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Bramwell | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Lewis | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS JOSEPH WARD | Trustee | 14 April 2011 |
|
|||||
MARGARET JANE HALLET | Trustee | 14 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
LAN QUACH BANHAM | Trustee | 14 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £380.12k | £882.31k | £471.38k | £623.19k | £257.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £391.84k | £204.77k | £321.98k | £352.17k | £437.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £879.60k | N/A | £616.81k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £2.71k | N/A | £6.38k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £100.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £204.77k | N/A | £352.17k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.72k | N/A | £3.84k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £348.33k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO RAISING AND COLLECTING MONEY AND DONATING TO CHARITIES REGISTED WITH THE COMMISSION OR THE OFFICE OF THE SCOTTISH CHARITY REGULATOR OR ANY SUCCESSOR REGULATORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BANHAM FOUNDATION LIMITED
20 THORNSETT ROAD
LONDON
SW18 4EF
- Phone:
- 02076225151
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window