VICTORY GOSPEL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance Christian religion in Southampton and elsewhere in the United Kingdom by proclaiming and furthering the gospel of god concerning his son Jesus Christ our Lord and the preaching and teaching of uncompromised word of God ("The Gospel"); and to provide ministry to the homeless in Southampton and elsewhere by the provision of food, clothing and counselling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 20 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Howard Abbott | Chair | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susana Falaola Niudamu | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Limkani Wood | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurel N Ogbuh | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Taylor | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kiran Dev Konatham | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anyaogu Eric Ogbuh | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan William Lawson Ryder | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW WHITE | Trustee | 21 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £287.99k | £335.52k | £356.46k | £368.03k | £425.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £320.11k | £276.26k | £307.85k | £385.82k | £449.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £27.82k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/01/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN SOUTHAMPTON AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PLACE OR PLACES AS SHALL BE DECIDED UPON BY PROCLAIMING AND FURTHERING THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE UNCOMPROMISED WORD OF GOD ("THE GOSPEL"); AND 2) TO PROVIDE MINISTRY TO THE HOMELESS IN SOUTHAMPTON AND ELSEWHERE BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING AND COUNSELLING
Area of benefit
SOUTHAMPTON AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
VICTORY GOSPEL CHURCH
THE VICTORY CENTRE
154-156 PORTSWOOD ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO17 2NH
- Phone:
- 02380551300
- Email:
- admin@victory.uk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window