SCHOOL OF ROCK OUTDOOR ACTIVITY CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
World Challenge, Coast to Coast, Fundraising Disco
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 04 March 2011: Standard registration
- 11 May 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2013 | 01/04/2014 | 01/04/2015 | 01/04/2016 | 01/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.42k | £13.13k | £26.14k | £8.16k | £21.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.71k | £3.84k | £34.44k | £12.53k | £27.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED 2 MARCH 2011.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FAZAKERLEY, LIVERPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
FAZAKERLEY, LIVERPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window