TITCHFIELD FESTIVAL THEATRE PRODUCTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity runs theatrical performances in the area between Southampton and Portsmouth. It also runs a wardrobe, set and props hire function. The charity also employs technicians and staff for local theatres.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Total income:
£804,814
Donations and legacies | £374.67k | |
Charitable activities | £58.83k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £371.32k |
Total expenditure:
£576,780
Raising funds | £5.22k | |
Charitable activities | £571.56k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.22k | |
Charitable expenditure | £571.56k | |
Retained for future use | £228.03k |
People

14 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
452 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 04 October 2011: Standard registration
- 09 December 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 January 2015: Re-registered
- TITCHFIELD FESTIVAL THEATRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN FRASER | Chair | 22 April 2011 |
|
|||||
Christopher Milburn | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Mark Feeley | Trustee | 20 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Alan James | Trustee | 10 June 2012 |
|
|||||
Kay Elizabeth Fraser | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £864.65k | £1.50m | £1.36m | £494.42k | £804.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £655.07k | £1.10m | £1.18m | £531.05k | £576.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.40k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £839.00k | £1.46m | £1.17m | N/A | £374.67k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £23.58k | £0 | £93.54k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £33.27k | £0 | N/A | £58.83k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.08k | £0 | £104.29k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £371.32k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £495.00k | £870.37k | £636.15k | N/A | £571.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £160.08k | £231.03k | £540.33k | N/A | £5.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.80k | £15.81k | £4.12k | N/A | £11.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £493.19k | £548.06k | £547.99k | N/A | £4.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £279.45k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £241.90k | £557.34k | £702.23k | N/A | £869.73k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £18.46k | £159.77k | £161.39k | N/A | £221.05k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £0 | £0 | £12.19k | N/A | £94.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 393 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 393 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 04 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED ON 01 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED ON 03 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED ON 01 JUL 2014
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THE DRAMATIC AND PERFORMING ARTS, AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ARTS BY THE PROVISION OF A THEATRE AND FACILITIES FOR THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES B) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE THEORY THAT WILLIAM SHAKESPEARE LIVED AND WORKED IN SOUTHERN HAMPSHIRE
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Sharlands Road
FAREHAM
Hampshire
PO14 1RD
- Phone:
- 01329600010
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window