THORNTON CLEVELEYS BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE FOSTERING AND PROMOTING OF THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES THE EDUCATION TRAINING IMPROVING AND GENERALLY FOSTERING AND PROMOTING THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND YOUNG PERSONS IN PARTICULAR IN THE PLAYING OF BAND INSTRUMENTS AND PROVIDING A PLACE WHERE PEOPLE WITH THAT INTEREST IN MUSIC CAN MEET.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 May 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JOHN SWANN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nicola Clare Holland | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Marshall | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD PAUL MIDGLEY | Trustee | 22 March 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.80k | £11.47k | £2.76k | £11.53k | £10.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.39k | £10.31k | £6.36k | £10.63k | £7.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 November 2020 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 APRIL 1975 AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 1993 AND 26TH MARCH 2001 as amended on 19 Apr 2018 as amended on 20 May 2024
Charitable objects
THE FOSTERING AND PROMOTING OF THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES AND AS ANCILLARY TO THE AFORESAID THE EDUCATION TRAINING IMPROVING AND GENERALLY FOSTERING AND PROMOTING THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND YOUNG PERSONS IN PARTICULAR IN THE PLAYING OF BAND INSTRUMENTS AND PROVIDING FOR PEOPLE SO INTERESTED IN A PLACE WHERE PEOPLE WITH THAT INTEREST IN MUSIC CAN MEET.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 GUILDFORD AVENUE
BLACKPOOL
FY2 9BE
- Phone:
- 07976130008
- Email:
- tcbsecretary@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window