THE KATIE HAINES MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1140558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise awareness of the dangers of carbon monoxide particularly relating to students and the elderly. To buy carbon monoxide alarms to donate to vulnerable sectors. Encourage people to buy an audible carbon monoxide detector for their homes and to take an alarm with them when going on holiday, whether in this country or abroad. To make carbon monoxide awareness films. To campaign for CO safety

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £3,651
Total expenditure: £5,677

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 February 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • KHMT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR GORDON SAMUEL Chair
None on record
Matthew Neville Rumbelow Trustee 23 February 2021
THE NATURE TRUST (SANDY)
Received: On time
CLAIRE ANNE HARDY BA Trustee 11 June 2011
None on record
LUCY ELIZABETH CHANT Trustee 11 June 2011
None on record
HANNAH PETTIT Trustee 11 June 2011
None on record
Lydia Pistis Trustee 26 January 2011
None on record
AVRIL BARBARA SAMUEL Trustee
None on record
RICHARD MARTIN HAINES Trustee
None on record
ADAM GORDON SAMUEL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £5.81k £5.83k £6.53k £13.60k £3.65k
Total expenditure £11.25k £7.39k £21.89k £8.24k £5.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 12 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Leah House
60
The Street
Marston Meysey
SWINDON
Wiltshir
Phone:
07903114998