ROSEHILL WESLEYAN REFORM CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The members of the church have held services prayer and fellowship meetings and social events that have all been open to members of the the public. Weddings dedications funerals and other events have also been held in the church.The building has been made available for use by the general public, voluntary and local authority organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
Governance
- 18 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP CHARLES HARTSHORN | Chair | 16 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Alan Kirk CEng FIMMM | Trustee | 16 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY IRWIN SRN | Trustee | 16 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARGUERITE BENNETT B/LIB | Trustee | 16 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
LT COL PAUL EDWARD BENNETT | Trustee | 16 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HARTSHORN | Trustee | 16 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.64k | £3.28k | £7.15k | £11.45k | £19.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.03k | £3.31k | £7.76k | £10.87k | £8.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 18 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DATED 27/10/1898
Charitable objects
The trustees for the time being shall at all times permit the said Premises and the Chapel School or other buildings from time to time standing thereon to be used and occupied and enjoyed as a place for the Public Worship of God and for the instruction of children and adults under the direction of the Society or Church assembling for worship thereon in connection with the said Denomination or Connexion according to the Principles Constitution Usages Polity and Rules from time to time of the said Denomination and also for the promotion of such other religious, educational or charitable purposes as the said Society or Church shall from time to time direct.
Area of benefit
BARNSLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Bowden Grove
Dodworth
Barnsley
S75 3TB
- Phone:
- 01226281969
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window