ST JAMES ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, WATFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly Sunday morning services of worship, including a children's programme, also Breakfast Church and Cafe Church mornings for different groups of members and the community. Weekly Toddlers group and Fortnightly craft group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 22 February 2011: Standard registration
- SJR (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mim Gale | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gale | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Rosena Gray | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Sheng Chueh Roberts | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin Dudley Beachcroft Roberts | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.26k | £54.58k | £77.99k | £56.42k | £64.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.04k | £44.78k | £45.30k | £69.59k | £59.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 2011.
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 - 5 St. James Road
WATFORD
HERTFORDSHIRE
WD18 0DZ
- Phone:
- 07795951970
- Email:
- secretary@sjrbc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window