CAVALIERMATTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of information and support via its website www.cavaliermatters.org Fund raising for research using stalls at major fairs such as Crufts and Discover Dogs Support for rescue of Cavalier King Charles Spaniels
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TANIA LEDGER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sandra Collins | Trustee | 19 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CARTER | Trustee | 17 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM LEDGER FCCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL FOWLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.67k | £12.61k | £12.82k | £3.08k | £15.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.79k | £12.11k | £13.43k | £5.59k | £17.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/05/2010 AS AMENDED ON 18/04/2011
Charitable objects
3.1 TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CAVALIER KING CHARLES SPANIELS AND DOGS IN GENERAL THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, INFOMMTION AND AWARENESS OF HEALTH MATTERS SURROUNDING CAVALIER KING CHARLES SPANIEL AND OTHER PEDIGREE DOGS AND DOGS IN GENERAL 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RESPONSIBLE DOG OWNERSHIP AND ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Silverstead Lodge
Silverstead Lane
WESTERHAM
Kent
TN16 2HY
- Phone:
- 07887637383
- Email:
- TANIA@CAVALIERMATTERS.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window