KINGDOM CITIZENS CHURCH (KCC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching and teaching; Baptism, as defined in the ChurchÔÇÖs ÔÇÿDeclaration of PrincipleÔÇÖ and under Beliefs; Education and training for Christian and community service: Pastoral and welfare care to individuals and groups; Supporting/encouraging charitable social actions Encouraging relationships with local Churches and other Christians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Haringey
- Reading
- Ghana
Governance
- 01 April 2011: Standard registration
- KCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev EMMANUEL ATAKORA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES OHENE-BEDIAKO | Trustee | 01 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.08k | £4.50k | £5.01k | £3.50k | £2.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £4.05k | £4.98k | £3.42k | £2.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31/01/2011
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES AND TEACHINGS OF THE BIBLE. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT LONDON GHANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
137 CHESTERTON ROAD
LONDON
W10 6ET
- Phone:
- 02088853184
- Website:
-
kingdomcitizenschurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window