BARNET REUSE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FURNITURE RECYCLING AND REUSE, VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE WITH DIFFICULTIES OR THE LONG-TERM UNEMPLOYED. OUR CHARITY DIVERTS OVER A 100 TONNES OF FURNITURE PER YEAR AWAY FROM LANDFILL AND HAS A TWO TIER PRICING SYSTEM, HEAVILY DISCOUNTED FOR THOSE IN RECEIPT OF BENEFITS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
Governance
- 22 February 2011: Standard registration
- BARNET FURNITURE CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachit Thakker | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Sault | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Franca Oliffe | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £442.63k | £386.21k | £484.72k | £522.09k | £456.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £433.53k | £363.04k | £469.41k | £496.34k | £457.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £44.75k | £9.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £271.02k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £250.88k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £200 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £252.73k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £243.62k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM 06 DEC 2010 as amended on 30 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
1 OBJECTS 1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1.1.1 THE RELIEF, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, 1.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, VOCATIONAL TRAINING OR RETRAINING AND THE PROVISION OF WORK EXPERIENCE PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE OR PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS IN ORDER TO ENHANCE THEIR PROSPECTS OF EMPLOYMENT, INDEPENDENCE AND QUALITY OF LIFE, 1.1.3 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE, RECLAMATION, RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS, (B) PARTAKING IN NATIONAL AND COMMUNITY SCHEMES AND PROJECTS FOR RECYCLING AND REUSING MATERIALS, COMPONENTS AND RESOURCES. 1.2 THE OBJECTS MAY BE AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION BUT ONLY WITH THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barnet Furniture Centre
4 Queens Parade Close
LONDON
N11 3FY
- Phone:
- 02083615825
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window