Arts for Dementia

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arts 4 Dementia exists to a) advance public understanding of dementia; and b) to relieve those living with dementia, including those who support or care for them, in particular through access to the arts and provision of therapeutic intervention related to the arts. It focuses particularly on the benefit of arts activities for people living in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 March 2011: Standard registration
- A4D (Working name)
- ARTS 4 DEMENTIA (Previous name)
- ARTS4DEMENTIA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jina Elise Swartz | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Imran Akram | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Frances O'Neill | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Ferguson | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Marie Fortune | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Halina Sawicka | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MERKEL | Trustee | 30 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.30k | £252.89k | £176.74k | £233.03k | £285.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.04k | £212.92k | £222.11k | £207.08k | £281.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/11/2013 as amended on 25 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1.1. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF DEMENTIA; AND 1.2. TO RELIEVE THOSE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA, INCLUDING THOSE WHO SUPPORT OR CARE FOR THEM, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH ACCESS TO THE ARTS AND THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTIONS RELATED TO THE ARTS; 2. ARTICLE 1 MAY BE AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION BUT ONLY WITH THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Arts for Dementia
Zeeta House
200 Upper Richmond Road
LONDON
SW15 2SH
- Phone:
- 020 3633 9954
- Email:
- info@artsfordementia.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window