Accounts and annual returns FISHING FOR FORCES

Charity Number: 1141744
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 05 August 2024 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 30 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 06 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 27 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 25 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 25 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window