HOME-START BUTSER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOME-START BUTSER SUPPORTS FAMILIES UNDER STRESS WHERE THERE IS AT LEAST ONE CHILD UNDER FIVE YEARS OF AGE. WE RECRUIT & TRAIN PARENT VOLUNTEERS WHO ARE MATCHED WITH A FAMILY & VISIT THEM IN THEIR OWN HOMES ONCE A WEEK TO OFFER PRACTICAL & EMOTIONAL SUPPORT. HOME-START BUSTER OPERATES IN EAST HAMPSHIRE IN ENGLAND.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,535 from 14 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 04 March 2011: Standard registration
- 20 September 2012: Funds received from 1057922 HOME START BUTSER
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jo Wright | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Newton | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Forbes Campbell | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Rose Bazant | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Butler | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abby Chloe Parker | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Sandberg | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Smart | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JUDD | Trustee | 13 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MURRAY WHEWELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.48k | £209.12k | £140.87k | £135.23k | £177.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.25k | £125.11k | £141.99k | £169.59k | £191.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.75k | £10.35k | £14.26k | £9.50k | £6.54k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM 24 JAN 2011
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE. 1) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; 2) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; 3) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; 4) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE; PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE AREA OF PETERSFIELD, HORNDEAN AND THEIR ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
PETERSFIELD, HORNDEAN AND THEIR ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOME START BUTSER
WINTON HOUSE
18 HIGH STREET
PETERSFIELD
GU32 3JL
- Phone:
- 01730233755
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window