MOOJI FOUNDATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Organising and facilitating Satsangs with Mooji internationally in the form of retreats and intensives - Advancing self-inquiry and actively guiding this process through direct instruction - Providing a wide range of Satsang material and broadcasts via the internet
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- City Of London
- Portugal
Governance
- 27 September 2011: Standard registration
- MOOJI SANGHA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Linnea JONSSON | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arun Tolu MELWANI VASWANI | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fatoumata Kamissoko Kanoute | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amrit Kaur | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rhonda Lee Johnson | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £618.15k | £689.41k | £208.55k | £166.10k | £187.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £834.67k | £705.50k | £728.56k | £966.26k | £286.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £401.35k | £463.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £216.21k | £225.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £592 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £580.63k | £562.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £254.03k | £66.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £161.65k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £418.99k | £549.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £76.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/10/2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF MORAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND PRACTICAL METHODOLOGY OF THE ADVAITA VEDANTA SCHOOL OF HINDU PHILOSOPHY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
447 STAINES ROAD WEST
ASHFORD
TW15 2AB
- Phone:
- 00447441394294
- Email:
- info@moojifoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window