BIRMINGHAM PARENT CARERS FORUM LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To empower parents to be active participants in the consultation process with the local authority and children's trust partners to influence the development of services that best meet the needs of children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Total income includes £85,400 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 07 March 2011: Standard registration
- 31 July 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PARENT VIEWS COUNT (Previous name)
- PVC (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.01k | £227.66k | £269.06k | £271.55k | £85.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.43k | £188.48k | £263.71k | £317.75k | £114.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £163.00k | £212.58k | £263.15k | £0 | £85.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.94k | £0 | £5.88k | £256.55k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 10 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 10 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 04 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 04 September 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/03/2014
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, THEIR PARENTS, FAMILIES AND CARERS ARISING BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; 2. TO INCREASE THE CAPACITY OF PARENTS, FAMILIES AND CARERS TO CARE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES IN ORDER TO IMPROVE RESULTS FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, ENABLING THEM TO REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AND ENSURE THE BEST OUTCOMES ARE ACHEIVED FOR ALL; AND 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ISSUES CONNECTED WITH CARING FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BUILDING THE CAPACITY OF PARENTS, FAMILIES AND CARERS TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS IN PLANNING SERVICES ACROSS BIRMINGHAM FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, THEIR PARENTS, FAMILIES AND CARERS WHO ARE RESIDENTS OF BIRMINGHAM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window