TOLL GAVEL UNITED CHURCH

Charity number: 1140314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The celebration of public worship. The teaching of the Christian faith. Mission and evangelism. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community, including (but not restricted to, the elderly, the young and other groups with special needs. The support of other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £139,083
Total expenditure: £126,090

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 2011: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev FRAN Rhys Chair 01 September 2021
None on record
Karen Smith Trustee 29 October 2024
None on record
Andrea Jayne Page Trustee 29 October 2024
None on record
Nigel Peter Dykes Trustee 01 January 2022
HULL YOUTH SUPPORT TRUST
Received: On time
Wendy Margaret Camilla Pearse Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
David John Powell Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Colin George Hogg Trustee 28 February 2019
None on record
Carolyn Nursey Trustee 29 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £148.08k £96.86k £94.09k £107.16k £139.08k
Total expenditure £116.18k £136.91k £90.65k £111.45k £126.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £14.14k N/A £6.17k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 20 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 11 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 October 2020 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 09 October 2020 101 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 Burney Close
BEVERLEY
Beverley
Beverley
East Yorkshire
HU17 7EQ
Phone:
01482867573