THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN WITH ST MARY MANSFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. The provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £70,980 from 1 government grant(s)
People

19 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 27 July 2011: Standard registration
- 08 December 2021: Funds received from 1161309 NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HOMELESS EYECARE
- ST JOHN'S WITH ST MARY'S PCC, MANSFIELD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher Mark Lee | Chair | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Spademan | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Louise Lake | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Greenfield | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Eden Parris | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Gordon Lane | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jake Daniel Hyatt | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Anne Harding | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Joy Cole | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Robert Cole | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Rachael Helen Lane | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLARE HARDING | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ASQUITH | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER WRIGHT | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Hartley | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MATHER | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ANN PEARCE | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter John Bradshaw Frith | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|||||
DAVID HENRY ROPER | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.93k | £194.30k | £148.15k | £256.89k | £324.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.18k | £189.34k | £179.35k | £241.62k | £332.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.92k | £1.33k | £200 | £20.98k | £70.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Excepted
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Centre
St. John Street
Mansfield
NG18 1QH
- Phone:
- 01623642338
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window