BANGOR STREET PASTORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the Christian Faith in Bangor accordance with the License Agreement executed with Ascension Trust by means of caring, listening and helping people on the streets and at various venues day and night.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 09 June 2011: Standard registration
- BUGEILIAID STRYD BANGOR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew James Lemon | Chair | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roshni Elizabeth Verghese | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Magnus Edward Forrester-Barker | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
THERESA RYAN | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Kavanagh | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Christopher Kavanagh | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR Gillian Christine Jamison | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Inmaculada Lebron Robinson | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.60k | £3.74k | £2.93k | £4.66k | £5.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.96k | £4.54k | £4.41k | £5.81k | £5.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 November 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Constitution
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN [TOWN] AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFILL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN [TOWN] AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LICENCE AGREEMENT EXECUTED WITH ASCENSION TRUST AND THE CORE VALUES AND MISSION STATEMENT APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN [TOWN] AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF CARING, LISTENING AND HELPING PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND AT VARIOUS VENUES DAY AND NIGHT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o Capel Emaus
Love Lane
Bangor
Gwynedd
LL57 2TE
- Phone:
- 0735572388774
- Email:
- bangor@streetpastors.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window