UNTANGLED INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Untangled International works to 'untangle' how to use business to advance missions in the developing world. We set up small businesses which fund rural church workers. Untangled provides support to these church workers in all areas of setting up and running these businesses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Malawi
Governance
- 04 May 2011: Standard registration
- UNTANGLED (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID TAYLOR MBA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr NIGEL JOHN KENWARD PHD | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Barry John Funnell | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.37k | £999 | £2.36k | £1.27k | £1.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.06k | £640 | £502 | £222 | £222 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/12/2010
Charitable objects
4.THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN MALAWI AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY RELIEVING POVERTY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY FACILITATING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF BUSINESS PARKS IN WHICH TRADING COMPANIES CAN BE DEVELOPED AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
MALAWI
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Anderson Crescent
Beeston
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 2PS
- Phone:
- 00 44 7826602541
- Website:
-
UNTANGLEDINTERNATI0NAL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window