Financial history SETTLE STORIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1141649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £194.43k £219.56k £249.54k £219.93k £277.33k
Total expenditure £175.71k £204.30k £244.25k £238.03k £283.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.00k £62.66k £36.67k £2.00k £1.00k