KIDS IN KATHMANDU NEPAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The sponsorship of 31 children and young adults through education age from 9 to 24 years. It includes 3 in 6th form and 14 in higher education. Provision of 6 breakfast clubs in 6 schools feeding just under 900 pupils every school day. Enhancing and improving facilities in the 6 schools through purchase of computers, installing solar panels, set up science labs and also replacing school furniture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bromley
- Nepal
Governance
- 27 May 2011: Standard registration
- KIKN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gurbi Sagoo | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Davies | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Pottinger | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Jackson OBE | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hamer | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CROWE | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Stephen Anthony Smith | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.25k | £68.64k | £77.21k | £115.44k | £69.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.82k | £68.38k | £64.11k | £65.58k | £79.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 JUL 2013
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF ORPHANED AND UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 24 YEARS IN KATHMANDU NEPAL BY THE PROVISION OF CLOTHING, EQUIPMENT OR OTHER GOODS FOR DAILY LIVING. 2.TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ORPHANED AND UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 24 YEARS IN KATHMANDU NEPAL BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES WHICH ASSIST IN ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION, DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 23
Dundee Wharf
100 Three Colt Street
LONDON
E14 8AX
- Phone:
- 07977072949
- Email:
- stephenanthonysmith@me.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window