Trustees HARROGATE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1140798
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANN CHESWORTH Chair 29 November 2016
None on record
Christopher Bishop Trustee 26 October 2022
None on record
Ann Kayes Trustee 26 October 2022
None on record
Akufuna Hicks Trustee 26 October 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Turner Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Sherida Humberstone Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Getgood Trustee 27 November 2018
None on record
LINDSAY LANSDALL Trustee 31 July 2012
None on record