VETERANS AT EASE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help service personnel, veterans and their families deal with the psychological effects of combat.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 March 2011: Standard registration
- 29 October 2021: Funds received from 240887 MAYORESS OF DURHAM'S FUND
- VETERANS @ EASE AND V@E (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL ANDREW ATKINSON | Chair | 30 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Commander Linda Elizabeth Cairney | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saul Gowens | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christina Murrell | Trustee | 28 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HEAPS | Trustee | 30 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.24k | £159.34k | £122.50k | £192.55k | £128.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.83k | £93.32k | £178.04k | £199.44k | £145.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Constitution
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF MILITARY AND CIVIL EMERGENCY VETERANS AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, COUNSELLING AND OTHER ACTIVITIES; THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Jackson Street
Gateshead
Tyne and Wear
NE8 1EE
- Phone:
- 01912499944
- Email:
- info@veteransatease.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window