FAST UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust is aiming to help, through projects, run locally by existing charities in Romania, the poorest Romanian children and adults by improving their overall living standards. This is done primarily through education schemes and re-housing and house improvement schemes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Romania
Governance
- 22 March 2011: Standard registration
- 21 July 2016: Funds received from 1048423 MISSION TO EASTERN EUROPE
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Barnardo | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Brewer | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tim White | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MORAG HEATHER PALMER | Trustee | 15 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.38k | £63.97k | £102.30k | £74.76k | £77.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.42k | £64.72k | £98.98k | £72.93k | £80.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07/02/2011
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF AID AND ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS RESIDENT IN ROMANIA WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Collingwood
FARNBOROUGH
Hampshire
GU14 6LX
- Phone:
- 01252 950017
- Email:
- contact@fastcharity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window