HOPELINK

Charity number: 1141534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

HOPELINK RAISES FUNDS TO SUPPORT THE CHRISTIAN WORK IN THE PHILIPPINES AND TO BRING RELIEF AID AND EDUCATIONAL ASSISTANCE TO THE POOREST PEOPLE AND COMMUNITIES IN THE PHILIPPINES.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £20,339
Total expenditure: £13,200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall
  • Philippines

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 April 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM RODNEY ORR Chair
None on record
Mary Judkins Trustee 06 October 2023
None on record
Wendy Lynne Harris Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record
LORNA JENNE Trustee
None on record
AMORES ORR Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.77k £18.33k £11.71k £10.85k £20.34k
Total expenditure £11.94k £12.64k £14.24k £12.52k £13.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 Wellington Road
Porthleven
HELSTON
Cornwall
TR13 9AB
Phone:
01326617989
Website:

hopelink.org.uk