THE WORD OF CHRIST CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES, EDUCATION/TRAINING AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES TO TEACH THE WORD OF GOD HOLDING CHURCH SERVICES FOR CHRISTIANS WHO WISH TO ATTEND WORSHIP AND ALSO CARRY OUT BIBLE STUDIES TO FURTHER THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH AND EDUCATING MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY AS NECESSARY; TO ENCOURAGE A PRAYERFUL AND CONSISTENT LIFE IN THEIR DEVOTIONAL AND SPIRITUAL GROWTH OF MEMBERS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 March 2011: Standard registration
- THE WORD OF CHRIST CHURCH (Previous name)
- THE WORD OF CHRIST CHURCH INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW KYEREMATENG | Trustee | 22 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
VIDA OBENG-YEBOAH | Trustee | 22 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MILLICENT BAKA | Trustee | 22 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ADADE | Trustee | 22 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
ERIC BOAKYE | Trustee | 22 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROPHET NANA BAKA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.53k | £15.38k | £22.88k | £34.42k | £28.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.85k | £21.59k | £28.56k | £22.69k | £35.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/06/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PENTECOSTAL AND EVANGELICAL DOCTRINE. THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY , BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Maryland Walk
Popham Street
Islington
London
N1 8QZ
- Phone:
- 02072262611
- Email:
- TWCCHURCH1@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window