Financial history BEECHWOOD COMMUNITY HALL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1140943
Charity reporting is up to date (226 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £31.87k £18.45k £13.28k £25.60k £33.34k
Total expenditure £21.17k £20.03k £16.77k £23.95k £25.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A