Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT DEVELOPMENT INITIATIVES LIMITED

Charity number: 1145432
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 28 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2014 11 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2013 29 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2012 29 May 2014 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 29 May 2014 363 days late