COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT DEVELOPMENT INITIATIVES LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Empowerment Development Initiatives Limited (CEDIS) undertakes two main activities. The first is supporting the operation of a microloan scheme in Ghana through its sister organisation CEDIS Ghana. The second is a volunteering programme that takes volunteers from the UK to Ghana to work with local organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ghana
Governance
- 13 January 2012: Standard registration
- 01 December 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CEDIS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.46k | £839 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.20k | £13.38k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 28 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 11 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 29 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 29 May 2014 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | 29 May 2014 | 363 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OF RELIEF OF POVERTY (OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP) IN GHANA BY PROVIDING EDUCATION, TRAINING, NOT-FOR-PROFIT MICROFINANCE AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window